VA HB1661 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Titling requirements for nonrepairable vehicles; sale to certain auto recyclers. Establishes a process whereby an insurance company can obtain a nonrepairable certificate for a vehicle acquired through the claims process without first obtaining a title or salvage certificate for such vehicle, provided that the insurance company is unable to obtain the assigned title or salvage certificate from the insured and has determined the vehicle to be a nonrepairable vehicle, any lien on the vehicle has been satisfied, and the vehicle is being sold to a demolisher, salvage dealer, or scrap metal processor for the purpose of recycling parts, dismantling, demolishing, or recycling for scrap.
Title
Nonrepairable vehicles; titling requirements, sale to certain auto recyclers.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 364 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1661ER) |
2023-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-16 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1661H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104639D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104639D-H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104017D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1064 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
SB1064 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
SB1064 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1608.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |