VA HB1661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Association health benefit plans established by associations of employers; health benefit plans for members of certain agricultural organizations. Authorizes a trust, as a benefits consortium, to sell health benefits plans to members of a sponsoring association, which is a nonstock corporation that operates as a nonprofit agricultural organization and is created primarily to promote programs for the development of rural communities and the economic stability and sustainability of farmers in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that the trust is subject to the federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 and U.S. Department of Labor regulations applicable to multiple employer welfare arrangements and to the authority of the U.S. Department of Labor to enforce such law and regulations. The bill requires the trust to operate as a nonprofit voluntary employee beneficiary association. The bill (i) prohibits a self-funded multiple employer welfare arrangement (MEWA) from issuing health benefit plans in the Commonwealth until it has obtained a license from the State Corporation Commission; (ii) provides that health benefit plans issued by a self-funded MEWA shall be subject to taxes and maintenance assessments levied upon insurance companies; (iii) provides that health benefit plans issued by a self-funded MEWA are subject to protections of and other provisions of the Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association; (iv) makes domestic self-funded MEWAs subject to all financial and solvency requirements imposed by provisions of Title 38.2 on domestic insurers unless domestic self-funded MEWAs are otherwise specifically exempted; and (v) provides that health benefit plans issued by a self-funded MEWA shall be exempt from all statutory requirements relating to insurance premium rates, policy forms, and policy cancellation and nonrenewal. The bill provides that the sponsoring association shall not, by virtue of its sponsorship of the benefits consortium or any benefits plan, be subject to the insurance laws of the Commonwealth or the tax levied on insurance companies pursuant to ?§58.1-2501.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Benefits consortium; formation by a sponsoring association as a nonprofit agricultural organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (36-Y 62-N) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (36-Y 62-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (36-Y 62-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's substitute printed 19107828D-H2
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1661ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 41-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106634D-S1 (58-Y 41-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1661S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106634D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (11-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106634D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1661H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106118D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106118D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100141D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823437.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3823437.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1661
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1661+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1661H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1661S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1661ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1661H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1401V0004+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0070+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2451+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0167+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0339+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1661+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0712HB1661+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3040+HB1661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3375+HB1661

Bill Comments

feedback