VA HB1661 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Information Technologies Agency; Division of Purchases and Supply; private institutions of higher education. Directs the Virginia Information Technologies Agency (VITA) and the Division of Purchases and Supply (the Division) to allow private institutions of higher education that are chartered by an Act of Congress in 1821, have owned and operated since 1991 a campus with a significant presence in the Commonwealth, and are granted tax-exempt status under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code to purchase directly from contracts established for state agencies and public bodies by VITA or the Division. Under current law, such institutions must be chartered in Virginia in order to purchase directly from contracts established for state agencies and public bodies by VITA or the Division.
Title
Virginia Information Technologies; contracts for private educational institutions.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1661ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1661H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104062D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104062D-H1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102561D |