VA HB1658 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility customer account information confidential. Provides that an electric utility or any officer, agent, or employee of the electric utility, or for any other person the electric utility authorizes to receive customer account information in connection with any business of the electric utility, shall not without the consent of the customer knowingly disclose any customer account information to any person, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Electric utility customer; account information confidential.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103692D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1658 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1658+hil |