VA HB1654 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schedule VI controlled substances; hypodermic syringes and needles; limited-use license. Allows the Board of Pharmacy to issue a limited-use license for the purpose of dispensing Schedule VI controlled substances, excluding the combination of misoprostol and methotrexate, and hypodermic syringes and needles for the administration of prescribed controlled substances to a doctor of medicine, osteopathic medicine, or podiatry, a nurse practitioner, or a physician assistant, provided that such limited-use licensee is practicing at a nonprofit facility. The bill requires such nonprofit facilities to obtain a limited-use permit from the Board and comply with regulations for such a permit. This bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Schedule VI controlled substances and hypodermic syringes and needles; limited-use license.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1654ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105315D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1074 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3304.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3467 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |