VA HB1652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit; agricultural best management practices. Creates an enhanced individual and corporate income tax credit beginning in taxable year 2020 for the implementation of certain agricultural best management practices by the taxpayer that are required as part of a certified resource management plan. The enhanced tax credit is equal to 75 percent of the first $100,000 expended in implementing certain agricultural best management practices, and each amount shall be consistent with the rate offered for each eligible practice under the Virginia Agricultural Best Management Practices Cost-Share Program. The amount of the enhanced credit shall not exceed $75,000. The bill retains a tax credit for 25 percent of expenses made for all other agricultural best management practices that are not eligible for the enhanced credit rate, but increases the maximum amount of expenses to which one can apply the 25 percent credit to $100,000.
Title
Income tax, state and corporate; tax credit, agricultural best management practices.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. David Bulova [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106501D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20103764D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 339.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |