VA HB1651 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; nonrefundable application fee; limitations. Provides that a landlord shall not obtain a consumer report or conduct any other investigation into the background or qualifications of a rental applicant without first establishing a written rental admission policy that is available to the public and providing the applicant with either a written or an electronic copy of such policy. The bill also provides that such policy must contain a disclosure of the amount of all nonrefundable application fees and deposits.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; nonrefundable application fee, limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100298D |