VA HB1650 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; Small Business Procurement Enhancement Program established; report. Establishes the Small Business Procurement Enhancement Program (the Program) with a statewide goal of 42 percent of small business utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts. In addition, the bill (i) provides for a small business set-aside for competition among all small businesses for state agency purchases of up to $100,000 for goods, nonprofessional services, and construction and up to $80,000 for professional services and (ii) establishes certification criteria for participation in the Program by business operations on the basis of the total number of employees or annual gross receipts, averaged over the previous three years. Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; Small Business Procurement Enhancement Program established; report. Establishes the Small Business Procurement Enhancement Program (the Program) with a statewide goal of 42 percent of small business utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts. In addition, the bill (i) provides for a small business set-aside for competition among all small businesses for state agency purchases of up to $100,000 for goods, nonprofessional services, and construction and up to $80,000 for professional services and (ii) establishes certification criteria for participation in the Program by business operations on the basis of the total number of employees or annual gross receipts, averaged over the previous three years.
Title
Small Business Procurement Enhancement Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105275D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1650 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |