VA HB1649 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pawnbrokers and precious metals dealers; required to be maintained; certain digital images. Requires pawnbrokers and precious metals dealers to take a digital image of the form of identification used by the person pawning, pledging, or selling the goods or articles, and requires such identification to bear a photograph of the person. The bill also prohibits a pawnbroker from pawning or accepting goods or articles if the original serial number affixed to the good or article has been removed, defaced, or altered.
Title
Pawnbrokers and precious metals dealers; records required to be maintained, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. James Scott [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Michael Watson [R] |
Del. David Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1649ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100874D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 4009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |