VA HB1648 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State correctional facilities; treatment of prisoners known to be pregnant or who are parents of minor children. Provides for rules and regulations regarding the treatment, control, and education of prisoners known to be pregnant and prisoners who are primary caretakers of minor children in state correctional facilities. The bill requires the Department of Corrections to include in the training it provides for state correctional officers and juvenile correctional officers who may have contact with pregnant inmates training on the general care of pregnant women and the impact of restraints, restrictive housing or solitary confinement, and body cavity searches on such inmates. The bill requires the Director of the Department of Corrections, after accounting for safety, security, and operational factors, to place prisoners who are known primary caretakers of minor children in a facility as close as possible to such children. The bill also requires correctional officers, when (i) contact is required between such officer and an inmate, (ii) the inmate is required to disrobe, and (iii) the officer is not the same gender as the inmate, to submit a written report to the official in charge of the state or local correctional facility within 72 hours following the incident containing the justification for the suspension of the requirement that such incident occur only during the period of a declared emergency. The bill further authorizes the Director of the Department of Corrections to prescribe reasonable rules regarding visitation that include authorization of visitation by minor dependents of prisoners who are primary caretakers of minor children with Level 1 or Level 2 security classifications.
Title
Correctional facilities, state; treatment of prisoners known to be pregnant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1648ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Social Service and Corrections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1648H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107870D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107870D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20100777D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 133.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 133.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 133.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 25.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 35.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 40.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 40.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |