VA HB1648 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Pedestrian crossings; Town of Ashland. Adds the Town of Ashland to the list of localities that may provide by ordinance for the installation and maintenance of highway signs at marked crosswalks requiring drivers to yield to pedestrians. A violation of such ordinance is a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of no less than $100 or more than $500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pedestrian crossings; Town of Ashland may provide signs at crosswalks requiring drivers to yield.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1648ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-17HouseRead first time
2019-01-15HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-11-27HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-11-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101366D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462924(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback