VA HB1648 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Notice by trustee required before foreclosure sale; tenant of property subject to sale. Requires a trustee to give written notice to any tenant living in property subject to foreclosure. The bill provides the contents of such written notice and requires the trustee to serve such notice at least 30 days prior to a foreclosure sale by mail or hand delivery.
Title
Notice by trustee required before foreclosure sale; tenant of property subject to sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102435D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1648 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1648+hil |