VA HB1643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Election day; extending polling hours. Extends from 7:00 p.m. to 8:00 p.m. the time at which polls close on election day. The bill aligns candidate filing deadlines and party nomination deadlines with the closing of polls.
Title
Election day; extending polling hours from 7:00 p.m. to 8:00 p.m.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1678-Lindsey) by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105493D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1678 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1643 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1643+hil |