VA HB1642 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession and administration of naloxone. Adds employees of the Department of Forensic Science, employees of the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner, and employees of the Department of General Services Division of Consolidated Laboratory Services to the list of individuals who may possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist, provided that they have completed a training program. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 1031.
Title
Naloxone or other opioid antagonist; possession and administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 107 (effective 2/21/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103429D-E |
2017-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1642E |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17103429D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Emergency Legislation
Forensic Science
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Professions and Occupations
Emergency Legislation
Forensic Science
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Professions and Occupations