VA HB164 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowances for jurors; unclaimed funds; retention by the court for jury operations or expenses. Exempts funds held by the court for payment to a juror from the provisions of the Virginia Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act and provides that such funds may be used by the court for jury operations or other jury-related expenses if such funds are unclaimed for more than one year after becoming payable.
Title
Jurors; allowances, unclaimed funds, retention by the court for jury operations or expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102195D |