VA HB1639 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; work group to research rural fill disposal. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) to convene a work group to research the practice of rural landowners allowing, or allowing for compensation, the use of their lands as disposal sites for construction fill and debris from road construction and development projects. The work group shall consider recommending regulations for possible adoption by DEQ, including a regulation containing a model ordinance relating to the practice for adoption by localities, and statutory changes, including changes to the practice related to agricultural engineering operations and construction of terraces.
Title
Rural lands; DEQ shall convene work group to discuss issue of disposal of debris on lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1639ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (67-Y 31-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House (67-Y 31-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment 20108829D-S1 (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1639S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108829D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108829D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105941D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1639E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (18-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105941D |