VA HB1635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; labor organizations. Repeals enactments adopted in 2018 as part of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) funding bills related to bidders, offers, contractors, and subcontractors to WMATA projects located in the Commonwealth participating with labor organizations.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; labor organizations.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1635ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (7-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105970D |
Same As/Similar To
SB995 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)