VA HB1635 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Historic rehabilitation tax credit. Limits the amount of historic rehabilitation tax credits that may be claimed by each taxpayer to $5 million per year, including any amounts carried over from prior taxable years. The limit is in effect for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2017.
Title
Historic rehabilitation; limits amount of tax credits that may be claimed by each taxpayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101772D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1635 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1635+hil |