VA HB1635 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary jail facilities; Chesapeake. Allows the City of Chesapeake to receive a waiver from the construction requirements of the "Standards for Planning, Design, Construction and Reimbursement of Local Correctional Facilities" for a jail enlargement project using a temporary structure for housing community custody inmates. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Jail facilities, temporary; Chesapeake allowed certain waivers for current temporary structures.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Del. Barry Knight [R] |
Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 3/16/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1635ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1635H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104121D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104121D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #3 |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13101758D |
Same As/Similar To
SB729 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)