VA HB1633 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1633

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Education; school modernization loan interest rate subsidy payments; eligibility. Requires the Board of Education to establish a program to use Literary Fund proceeds to subsidize interest payments on certain loans made by the Virginia Public School Authority to local governing bodies and school boards for the design and construction of new school buildings and facilities or the modernization and maintenance of existing school buildings and facilities as follows: for school divisions in localities determined to have above-average or high fiscal stress by the Commission on Local Government in its most recent version of such report, the Board shall subsidize up to 100 percent of the interest due on such loan. Under current law, eligibility for such interest rate subsidy payment is based on the local composite index of ability to pay.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, Board of; school modernization loan interest rate subsidy payments, eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
2020-02-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20104506D

Same As/Similar To

HB1633 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221146.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1633
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1633+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1633AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1633F122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0901C0039+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09C0085+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0203C0014+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02C0090+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HC0616+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04C0342+HB1633
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0510+HB1633

Bill Comments

feedback