VA HB1632 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Board; duties. Requires the Common Interest Community Board to develop and publish best practices for the content of declarations consistent with the requirements of the Property Owners' Association Act.
Title
Common Interest Community Board; duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1632ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 15102487D-E |
2015-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1632E |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102487D |