VA HB1630 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Report of money kept by clerk; money held recorded in civil law book; recording in the order book. Requires the clerk to make available to the Auditor of Public Accounts a copy of the annual report that the clerk is currently required to provide to the court regarding the receipt of money by the clerk. The bill further directs the clerk to record (i) trust fund orders and (ii) the annual trust fund report regarding the receipt of money in the civil order book. The bill removes the requirement that such recordings are in addition to, but not in lieu of, any other required recording.
Title
Circuit court clerks; report of money kept by clerk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017 | |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1630ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101472D |
Subjects
Auditor of Public Accounts
Circuit Courts
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Clerks of Courts
Courts of Record
Circuit Courts
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Clerks of Courts
Courts of Record
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |