VA HB1630 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Problem-Solving Courts; established. Establishes the Problem-Solving Court Act(the Act). The bill allows the establishment of problem-solving courts as specialized court dockets within the existing structure of Virginia's court system, offering judicial monitoring of intensive treatment and supervision of offenders who have special conditions and needs based on military service, mental illness, or societal re-entry. The bill establishes a state problem-solving court docket advisory committee and requires localities intending to establish such courts to establish local advisory committees. The Supreme Court of Virginia is given administrative oversight for the implementation of the Act. The Act is modeled on the Drug Treatment Court Act (§18.2-254.1).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Problem-Solving Courts; established, report.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2015-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2015-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102024D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182254.2(n/a)See Bill Text
222001.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback