VA HB1629 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regional transportation sector emissions programs; participation by Commonwealth. Prohibits the Governor or any state agency from adopting any regulation establishing or bringing about the participation by the Commonwealth in the Transportation and Climate Initiative or any other regional transportation sector emissions program. The bill provides that the Commonwealth shall be allowed to participate in such a regional transportation sector emission program if the House of Delegates and the Senate of Virginia each adopt a resolution by majority vote that specifically references and approves the regulatory text proposed for adoption by a state agency.
Title
Regional transportation sector emissions programs; participation by Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105556D |