VA HB1628 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private security; compliance agent experience; surety bond. Removes the requirement that a compliance agent for a private security services business have either five years of experience or three years of managerial or supervisory experience in a private security services business, a state or local law-enforcement agency, or a related field. The bill also removes the option for a private security services business or a private security services training school to be covered by a bond in lieu of liability insurance. The bill provides that it will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2018 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Private security; compliance agent experience, surety bond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective -see bill) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1628ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1628E |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-24 | House | Passed by until Monday, January 30, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2017-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101612D-E |
2017-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1628E |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101612D |
Subjects
Commonwealth Public Safety
General Assembly
Private Detectives and Private Security
Professions and Occupations
General Assembly
Private Detectives and Private Security
Professions and Occupations