VA HB1627 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Threats and harassment of certain officials and property; venue. Provides that certain crimes relating to threats and harassment may be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if venue cannot otherwise be established and the victim is (i) the Governor, Governor-elect, Lieutenant Governor, Lieutenant Governor-elect, Attorney General, or Attorney General-elect, a member or employee of the General Assembly, a justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia, or a judge of the Court of Appeals of Virginia and (ii) such official or employee was threatened or harassed while engaged in the performance of his public duties or because of his position with the Commonwealth. In addition, threats to damage property may be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if venue cannot otherwise be established and the property is owned by the Commonwealth and located in the Capitol District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Threats and harassment of certain officials and property; certain crimes prosecuted in Richmond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1002)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1002 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1627ER)
2020-03-04HouseEnrolled
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: Adoption (65-Y 35-N)
2020-02-27HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (65-Y 35-N)
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N)
2020-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-24SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-24SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N)
2020-02-07HousePrinted as engrossed 20105343D-E
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1627E
2020-02-07HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2020-02-02HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20105343D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182152.7:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182430(n/a)See Bill Text
18260(n/a)See Bill Text
18260.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18283(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1627&201+sum+HB1627
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1627+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1627E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1627ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1002+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0105+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0113+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0178+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0665+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0383+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1627+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0976HB1627+HB1627
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1555+HB1627

Bill Comments

feedback