VA HB1627 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; child welfare agencies; prioritization of inspections. Requires the Commissioner of Social Services to prioritize inspections of child welfare agencies in the following order: (i) inspections conducted in response to a complaint; (ii) inspections of licensed or registered child welfare agencies; (iii) inspections of license-exempt or unlicensed child welfare agencies that have entered into a contract with the Department of Social Services or a local department to provide child care services funded by the Child Care and Development Block Grant; and (iv) inspections of license-exempt and unlicensed child welfare agencies.
Title
Child welfare agencies; Commissioner of Social Services shall prioritize inspection of agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1627ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-10-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-10-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100452D |