VA HB1626 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction. Provides that a Capitol Police officer who is a detector canine handler has concurrent jurisdiction with the law-enforcement officers of another jurisdiction that has requested the assistance of the Capitol Police in the detection of firearms, ammunition, explosives, propellants, or incendiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rules (11-Y 1-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20105342D

Same As/Similar To

SB996 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0897)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback