VA HB1626 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Animal fighting; confiscation of tethered cocks. Provides that an animal control officer shall confiscate a tethered cock if such cock has been, is, or is intended to be used in animal fighting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal fighting; one or more tethered cocks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 345 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N 1-A)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107056D-S1 (80-Y 18-N 1-A)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1626S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107056D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107056D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House (78-Y 16-N)
2019-01-23HousePrinted as reengrossed 19100448D-E2
2019-01-23HouseReengrossed by House as amended HB1626E2
2019-01-23HouseAmendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
2019-01-23HouseCommittee amendment rejected
2019-01-23HouseCommittee amendment reconsidered
2019-01-23HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2019-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 19100448D-E
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1626E
2019-01-22HouseAmendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
2019-01-22HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-18HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-10-23HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-10-23HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100448D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326571(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1626
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1626+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1626E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1626E2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1626S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1626ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0345+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0101V0005+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0004+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1836+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0077+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0289+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1626+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0753HB1626+HB1626
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3039+HB1626

Bill Comments

feedback