VA HB1623 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth; student registration. Permits any student whose service member parent is relocated to the Commonwealth pursuant to orders received to register for courses and other academic programs and participate in the lottery process for charter schools and college partnership laboratory schools in the school division in which such student will reside at the same time and in the same manner as students who reside in the local school division. This bill is identical to SB 1249.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth, student registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1623ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100465D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1623E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-21HouseReported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-10-17HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-10-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100465D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2213(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1623
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1623+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1623E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1623ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0404+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0003+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0017+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0011+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0021+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2299+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0235+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1623+HB1623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1623+HB1623

Bill Comments

feedback