VA HB1622 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Open-Space Lands Preservation Trust Fund; acquisition of interests in property. Authorizes the Virginia Outdoors Foundation, in administering the Open-Space Lands Preservation Trust Fund, to provide grants to persons conveying to the Foundation fee simple title or other rights, interests, or privileges in property on agricultural, forestal, or other open-space land and to provide grants to localities acquiring such interests. Current law authorizes the Foundation to provide such grants for the acquisition of open-space and conservation easements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open-Space Lands Preservation Trust Fund; acquisition of interests in property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1622ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (84-Y 12-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 12-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1622H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106055D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106055D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20105601D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011801.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581817(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback