VA HB1621 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1621

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council created; report. Creates the Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council as an advisory council in the legislative branch of state government to encourage urban agriculture and contribute to building a local food economy. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20105263D

Same As/Similar To

HB1621 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323122(n/a)See Bill Text
323127(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback