VA HB1620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1620
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Individual and corporate income tax credit; employers of National Guard members and self-employed National Guard members. Allows a tax credit for employers of National Guard members and self-employed National Guard members. Individual and corporate income tax credit; employers of National Guard members and self-employed National Guard members. Allows a tax credit for employers of National Guard members and self-employed National Guard members.
Title
Income tax, state and corporate; tax credit for employers of National Guard members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-29 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20106817D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB230 (Freitas) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105963D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1620 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote