VA HB162 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; enhanced retirement Virginia Retirement System; enhanced retirement benefits for animal control officers. Adds animal control officers to the list of local employees eligible to receive enhanced retirement benefits for hazardous duty service. Under current law, localities may provide such benefits to first responders, including firefighters and emergency medical technicians, and certain other hazardous duty positions.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; enhanced retirement benefits for animal control officers.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101292D |