VA HB162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm-free zones designated by the Commonwealth or a locality; waiver of sovereign immunity. Provides that (i) if the Commonwealth designates any property owned by it or (ii) if any locality designates such locality or any part of such locality as a firearm-free zone, the Commonwealth or such locality waives its sovereign immunity as it relates to any injuries sustained by persons lawfully present in such firearm-free zone.
Title
Firearm-free zones designated by the Commonwealth or a locality; waiver of sovereign immunity.
Sponsors
Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103493D |