VA HB1619 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1619

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; subtraction for low-income military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability. Provides an income tax subtraction for the military retirement income received by a veteran who has been rated with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only to those taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income is not greater than 150 percent of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; subtraction for low-income military veterans with a service-connected disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1619H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106819D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106819D-H1
2020-01-29HouseIncorporates HB125 (Miyares)
2020-01-29HouseReported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20105965D

Same As/Similar To

HB125 (Similar To)
HB1619 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581322.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback