VA HB1618 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; required deposits. Requires deposit of any revenues that would be required to be deposited in the Revenue Stabilization Fund or Revenue Reserve Fund to be deposited in the Taxpayer Relief Fund, established by the bill, in certain circumstances. Such deposits shall be made if the combined balance in the Revenue Stabilization Fund or Revenue Reserve Fund exceeds 15 percent of the Commonwealth's average annual tax revenues derived from taxes on income and retail sales.
Title
Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; required deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2023-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101662D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1812.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1829 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1831.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |