VA HB1618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Virginia State Crime Commission
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Virginia State Crime Commission
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury investigations. Provides that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate any condition that involves or tends to promote criminal violations of any law of the Commonwealth. Under current law, the jurisdiction of a multi-jurisdiction grand jury is limited to certain enumerated criminal offenses.
Title
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Senate | Letter sent to the Virginia State Crime Commission |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105966D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |