VA HB1615 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recordation tax; deeds of trust or mortgages. Provides that for a deed of trust or mortgage (i) that conveys property that is either (a) partly within and partly outside the Commonwealth or (b) is within the Commonwealth and secures debts secured by deeds of trust on property outside the Commonwealth and (ii) secures the entire amount of that debt, recordation tax shall only be imposed on the proportion of debt that the Virginia property bears to the actual value of the entire amount of property conveyed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recordation tax; supplemental writings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1615ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1615H1
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106827D-H1
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106827D-H1
2020-01-29HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20104636D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581809(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback