VA HB1613 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school teachers; technical professional licenses; eligibility criteria. Requires the Board of Education, pursuant to regulation, to permit any individual who seeks a technical professional license to substitute the successful completion of an intensive, job-embedded, three-year program of professional development for the nine semester hours of professional studies required for such license.
Title
Public school teachers; technical professional licenses, eligibility criteria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1613ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105247D |