VA HB1612 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-27 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-27 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any city and certain towns to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and that may endanger the public health, safety, or welfare to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually.
Title
Vacant building; annual registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1482-Ward) by voice vote |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101907D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1612 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1612+hil |