VA HB1612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Physical Privacy Act. Creates the Physical Privacy Act, which requires that a government entity provide for members of the opposite sex separate restrooms and other facilities in a building owned, leased, or otherwise controlled by the entity. The bill provides that, subject to certain exceptions, no individual shall enter a restroom or other facility designated for use by members of the opposite sex. The bill creates a civil cause of action against a government entity for an individual who accesses a restroom or other facility designated for use by members of such individual's sex and encounters a member of the opposite sex if the government entity allowed the member of the opposite sex to use such restroom or other facility or failed to take reasonable steps to prohibit such use. The bill also requires that the principal of a public school notify within 24 hours the parent or guardian of a child attending such school if the child requests to be recognized or treated as the opposite sex, to use a name or pronoun inconsistent with the child's sex, or to use a restroom or other facility designated for the opposite sex.
Title
Physical Privacy Act; created.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] |
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Rick Morris [R] | Del. Brenda Pogge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103140D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Property Grounds and Buildings State-owned
Public Buildings Facilities and Property
Property Grounds and Buildings State-owned
Public Buildings Facilities and Property
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1612 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1612+hil |