VA HB1609 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transit Ridership Incentive Program; on-demand microtransit operations. Includes the development and implementation of on-demand microtransit operations, defined in the bill, to incentivize and promote transit ridership, as part of the goal of the Transit Ridership Incentive Program. The bill provides that an approved initiative or service is eligible to continue receiving funding for the duration of the Program on an annual basis, for up to 80 percent of costs, from funds that are available to the urbanized area in which the initiative or service is located.
Title
Transit Ridership Incentive Program; on-demand microtransit operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103058D |