VA HB1608 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families. Provides that the Department of Social Services is designated as the state agency responsible for coordinating state efforts related to supporting public agencies and charitable and community groups seeking to assist low-income Virginians in their efforts to become self-sufficient and establishes the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Fund to supplement the Department's administration of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families block grant and assist the Commonwealth in maximizing program funds by leveraging individual, corporate, and charitable donations.
Title
TANF; establishes Fund, State to support agencies, etc., seeking to assist low-income Virginians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2011-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1608ER) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-19 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101542D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1224 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)