VA HB1604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Game and Inland Fisheries; boat ramp fees; exemptions. Authorizes the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to charge a fee for the use of any facility that the Department manages and any boat ramp that the Department owns or manages. Current law authorizes such fee only for a facility that is owned by the Department. The bill adds exemptions from such fees for a person holding a valid access permit issued by the Department and any person who is a passenger in but not the owner or operator of a paddlecraft or registered vessel. The bill includes technical changes.
Title
Game and Inland Fisheries, Department of; boat ramp fees; exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 1-N) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 321 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1604ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105271D |