VA HB1603 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic incident management vehicles. Allows traffic incident management vehicles, defined in the bill, to be equipped with flashing red or red and white secondary warning lights.
Title
Traffic incident management vehicles; definition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105042D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1603 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1029.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |