VA HB1603 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; eligibility of certain caregivers. Entitles a person to vote absentee if the person is unable to go in person to the polls on the day of the election because he is primarily and personally responsible for the care of an ill or disabled individual who is confined at home. Currently, such caregivers are entitled to vote absentee only if the ill or disabled individual who is confined at home is a family member of the caregiver.
Title
Absentee voting; eligibility of certain caregivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101279D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1603 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1603+hil |