VA HB1601 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act. Amends the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act (UIFSA) to comply with amendments to the Hague Convention on the International Recovery of Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance that were adopted in 2008. The amendments modify the current version of UIFSA's international provisions to comport with the obligations of the United States under the 2007 Hague Convention on the International Recovery of Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act (UIFSA); amends Act to modify current version.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 727 (effective 4/15/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1601ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1601ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1601H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103897D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103897D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/14/15 15101405D |