VA HB1599 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; definitions; law-enforcement officer. Adds (i) members of the investigations unit designated by the State Inspector General to investigate allegations of criminal behavior affecting the operations of a state or nonstate agency and (ii) employees of the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice with internal investigations authority to the definition of law-enforcement officer. Such members and employees would not be eligible for Line of Duty Act benefits.
Title
Criminal Justice Services, Department of; definitions of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1599ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107345D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1599S1 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107345D-S1 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107345D-S1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1599H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106032D-H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106032D-H1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105615D |