VA HB1599 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voter registration; political party affiliation. Provides that a voter who votes in a primary election held by a political party shall be designated on his registration record as affiliated with that political party. The bill requires the State Board to use the list of persons voting in a primary election submitted by the electoral boards to designate a political party affiliation on the registration record for each voter, but prohibits the State Board of Elections from designating a political party affiliation for a voter until the voter has voted in a primary election held on or after January 1, 2016. Voters may change their party affiliation or designate themselves as independents by providing written notice to the general registrar for the locality in which they are registered. The bill does not change Virginia's present primary laws, and all registered voters remain eligible to participate in the primary of a political party that chooses to nominate by primary. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2016.
Title
Voter registration; political party affiliation on registration record.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101890D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 410.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1599 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1599+hil |